EP2343448 - WAVE POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ship Ltd. Kalevipoja tn. 3 - 64 Tallinn 13625 / EE | For all designated states Shpinev, Igor Nikolaevich Kalevipoja tn. 3 - 64 Tallinn 13625 / EE | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHPINEV, Igor Nikolaevich Kalevipoja tn 3-64 Tallinn 13625 / EE | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Jeck, Anton Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 09843116.6 | 08.04.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009RU00166 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010117291 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343448 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/20 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
F03B13/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | F03B13/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | WELLENKRAFTWERK | [2011/28] | English: | WAVE POWER PLANT | [2011/28] | French: | CENTRALE HOULOMOTRICE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2011 | Translation filed | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/26] | 25.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE202006010897U (ZAKHER ALEXANDER [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2008206077 (ROYSET DAGFINN [NO]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0029] , [0038] - [0042]; figures 1,6 *; | [I]FR879826 (M. RENÉ-AUGUSTE IRLE) [I] 1,2 * page 2, columns 83-93; figure 3 *; | [A]US2009015103 (RASTEGAR JAHANGIR S [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0066]; figure 7 * | International search | [Y]DE202006010897U (ZAKHER ALEXANDER [DE]); | [Y]US2008206077 (ROYSET DAGFINN [NO]); | [Y]SU1291489 (TS K B MIN RECHNOGO FLOTA RSFS [SU]); | [A]RU1774061 (LARIN IVAN P [SU]); | [A]GB191109231 (AYERS EDWARD LYTTON [CA]) | by applicant | EP1342916 | DE60218900T | DE202006010897U |