EP2431162 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PNEUMATIC TIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PNEUMATIC TIRE | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Company, Limited 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, Takuzou c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
TAKADA, Noboru c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2012/29] | Hards, Andrew, et al Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Prinzregentenstraße 11a 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Hards, Andrew Hards & Franke Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Widenmayerstraße 25 DE-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09844352.6 | 17.06.2009 | [2016/09] | WO2009JP61053 | Priority number, date | JP20090112877 | 07.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009112877 | [2012/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010128565 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431162 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431162 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/08, B29C33/02, B29C35/02, B60C5/14, B29L30/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B29D30/2607 (EP,US);
B29D30/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C33/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C35/02 (KR);
B29D30/0601 (EP,US);
B29D30/0654 (EP,US);
B29D30/0681 (EP,US);
B29D30/10 (EP,US);
B29D30/246 (EP,US);
B60C1/0008 (EP,US);
B60C5/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29D2030/0647 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LUFTREIFEN | [2015/50] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PNEUMATIC TIRES | [2015/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PNEUMATIQUES | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/12] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LUFTREIFENS | ||
Former [2012/12] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PNEUMATIC TIRE | ||
Former [2012/12] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PNEUMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2011 | Translation filed | 07.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 24.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | GB | 17.06.2016 | IE | 17.06.2016 | LU | 17.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.06.2009 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
GB | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.06.2009 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
GB | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
GB | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4684422 (ROEDSETH JOHN K [LU]) [I] 1-6 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-8 *; | [I]US4634489 (DUPOMMIER JEAN M [BE]) [I] 1-6 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 67; figures 1-6 *; | [I]US4007080 (KLOPPER FRIEDRICH) [I] 1-6 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US3867230 (VAN HORN RUSSELL F, et al) [I] 1-6 * column 1, line 7 - column 7, line 27; figures 2-11 *; | [A]US2002033557 (HASHIMURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0068]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]WO2004048075 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005219565 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007030691 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007098764 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JPS5878740 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]JP2008044204 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005297478 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001315128 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009029035 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007050571 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009018445 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003245928 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JP2001088143 | JP2003340824 |