EP2429913 - DISPENSING CLOSURE FOR CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Click Cap Tech SDN. BHD. Unit 1201 12th Floor Amcorp Trade Centre PJ Tower No. 18 Persiaran Barat Off Jalan Timur Petaling Jaya Selangor 46050 / MY | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Weyyip 2 Jalan Kenyalang 11/6F PJU 5 Kota Damansara Selangor 47810 / MY | 02 /
MARNICKAVASAGAR, Rajendran Unit 1201 12th Floor Amcrop Trade Centre PJ Tower No. 18 Persiaran Barat Off Jalan TImur Petaling Jaya Selangor 46050 / MY | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Graham Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Forrest, Graham Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09844703.0 | 15.05.2009 | WO2009MY00060 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010131938 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429913 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/08, B65D51/28, B65B29/10, B65D81/32 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B65D51/2821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | ABGABEVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2012/12] | English: | DISPENSING CLOSURE FOR CONTAINER | [2012/12] | French: | FERMETURE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR RÉCIPIENT | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 08.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008041738 (O'DONNELL BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 1-3,9 * [I] 6,8-12; | [A]DE2432290 (WUNSCH ERICH) [A] 1,15 * figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]CA2228030 (ROCEP LUSOL HOLDINGS [GB]); | [A]DE10143537 (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9965783 (CLARKSON ARON JOSEPH [AU]) |