EP2452110 - FLUID FLOW CONTROL DEVICES AND SYSTEMS, AND METHODS OF FLOWING FLUIDS THERETHROUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAINES, Bradford c/o Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | 02 /
GIFFORD, Decker c/o Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | 03 /
HAEHL, Mark c/o Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/37] |
Former [2012/20] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09845340.0 | 27.05.2009 | [2017/37] | WO2009US45344 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010138119 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452110 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2452110 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K47/06, F16K51/00, F16K1/52, F16L55/02, F16K47/08, F16L55/027 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
F16L55/02781 (EP);
F16K47/06 (KR);
F16K47/08 (EP,GB);
F16K1/52 (KR);
F16K51/00 (KR);
F16L55/02 (GB,KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | F16K47/06, F16K51/00, F16K1/52, F16L55/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSREGLER UND SYSTEME SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HINDURCHSTRÖMUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2012/20] | English: | FLUID FLOW CONTROL DEVICES AND SYSTEMS, AND METHODS OF FLOWING FLUIDS THERETHROUGH | [2012/20] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES DE RÉGULATION D'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE, ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE AU TRAVERS DE CES DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 27.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FR, TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | LU | 27.05.2018 | MT | 27.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]USRE31570E (CHARLES F. DREXEL) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12-15 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-3,13 * [Y] 3,7,8,11; | [Y]FR1546358 (RICHARD ERNST SELF) [Y] 3,7,8,11 * page 3, column r, line 21 - page 4, column l, line 2; figures 3,5 *; | [X]WO2007074342 (IMI VISION LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-15 * page 9, line 7 - page 15, line 9; figure - *; | [X]WO2008032078 (IMI VISION LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6-9,12-15 * page 7, line 18 - page 11, line 3; figure - * | International search | [X]US2004168730 (MCCARTY MICHAEL WILDIE [US], et al); | [A]US2005104023 (MORTON KAREN M [GB]); | [A]US2003188787 (STEINKE JOSEPH H [US]) |