EP2437733 - SUSTAINED RELEASE DOSAGE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAI, Dayu 35-501 No.2878 Gaoqing Road Shanghai 200124 / CN | 02 /
GAN, Yong 10-1702 No.88 East Jin An Rd. Shanghai 201204 / CN | 03 /
SCHMITT, Robert, L. 40 Regional Road Annandale New Jersey 08801 / US | 04 /
ZHU, Chunliu 7-302 2373 Long Hua Road Shanghai 200030 / CN | 05 /
CHAN, Alan, Ka Chun 5413 Tyler Street Midland Michigan 48642 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09845392.1 | 02.06.2009 | WO2009CN72099 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010139111 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437733 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/32, A61K9/22, A61K9/50, A61K47/38, A61K47/34, A61K9/00, A61K31/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | A61K9/32, A61K9/22, A61K9/50, A61K47/38, A61K47/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | RETARD-DARREICHUNGSFORM | [2012/15] | English: | SUSTAINED RELEASE DOSAGE FORM | [2012/15] | French: | FORME POSOLOGIQUE À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 05.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0347024 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples 1-3 *; | [X]WO2006123364 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN]; DHARMADHIKARI NITIN BHALACHAND [IN];) [X] 1-12 * examples 1-3 *; | [E]EP2085078 (COSCI MED TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-12 * example 2 *; | [X]WO2008052417 (COSCI MED TECH CO LTD [CN]; WANG JINGANG [CN]; JIANG HAISONG [CN]) [X] 1-12 * example 2 *; | [XI]WO02062299 (ANDRX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1 * examples 1,3 * [I] 2-12; | [I] - VERMA R K ET AL, "Formulation aspects in the development of osmotically controlled oral drug delivery systems", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020219), vol. 79, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00550-8, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 7 - 27, XP004340909 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00550-8 | [I] - FLORENCE LECOMTE ET AL, "pH-Sensitive Polymer Blends used as Coating Materials to Control Drug Release from Spherical Beads: Importance of the Type of Core", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (20050701), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1021/bm0500704, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 2074 - 2083, XP055031840 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm0500704 | International search | [X]CN101146521 (SUN PHARM IND LTD.); | [X]CN1074603 (BAYERAG); | [A]CN1923184 (BEIJING KEXIN BICHENG SCI & TECH DEV CO.); | [A]US6485748 (ANDRX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.); | [A]WO02062299 (ANDRX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) |