EP2443511 - CAMERA APPLICATIONS IN A HANDHELD DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard M/S: RNB-4-150 Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERREN, Bran 1236 Benedict Canyon Drive Beverly Hills, California 90210 / US | 02 /
NISHIHARA, H., Keith 1469 Richardson Ave. Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09846308.6 | 30.12.2009 | WO2009US69804 | Priority number, date | US20090187520P | 16.06.2009 Original published format: US 187520 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010147609 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443511 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, H04N5/232, H04N13/02, H04M1/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/0065 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/009 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/02 (KR);
G03B17/12 (KR);
G03B3/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/40 (EP);
G06F3/02 (EP,US);
G06F3/0236 (US);
G06F3/0237 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0414 (EP,US);
G06F3/0418 (CN);
G06F3/04186 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06K7/10811 (EP,CN,US);
G06K7/1408 (KR);
G06Q20/3276 (EP);
G06Q20/4012 (US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/165 (US);
G06V40/19 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/20 (US);
G06V40/45 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/083 (US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N23/45 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/183 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | G03B3/00, H04N5/225, G02B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | KAMERAANWENDUNGEN IN EINEM IN DER HAND GEHALTENEN GERÄT | [2012/17] | English: | CAMERA APPLICATIONS IN A HANDHELD DEVICE | [2012/17] | French: | APPLICATIONS DE PRISE DE VUES DANS UN DISPOSITIF PORTATIF | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 11.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP11192624.2 / EP2431782 | EP11192628.3 / EP2437213 | EP11192630.9 / EP2442167 | EP11192634.1 / EP2495594 | EP17168854.2 / EP3220180 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003117501 (SHIRAKAWA HIROTSUGU [JP]) [A] 11,12* abstract *; | [A]KR100738803B (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [XI]JP2008147756 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * [I] 11,12; | [A]US2009002797 (KWONG WAH YIU [US], et al) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [X]CN101408720 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN [CN]) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5594524 (SASAGAKI NOBUAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6657668 (HATA DAISUKE [JP]); | [A]US2004091256 (BROST RANDOLPH C [US]); | [A]US2004114918 (CAHALL SCOTT C [US]); | [A]US2006256229 (WERNERSSON MATS G H [US]) | Examination | US2008211941 | by applicant | US2003117501 | KR100738803B | JP2008147756 | US2009002797 | CN101408720 |