EP2461461 - APPARATUS FOR HANDLING MAGNET AND METHOD FOR HANDLING MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKUMA Yasushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TAKETSUNA Yasuji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09847801.9 | 29.07.2009 | WO2009JP63460 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011013209 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461461 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
Y10T156/12 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1317 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1322 (EP,US);
Y10T156/17 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US);
Y10T225/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES MAGNETEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES MAGNETEN | [2012/23] | English: | APPARATUS FOR HANDLING MAGNET AND METHOD FOR HANDLING MAGNET | [2012/23] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MANIPULER UN AIMANT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE MANIPULER UN AIMANT | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2012 | Translation filed | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 21.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009033958 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2002272033 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0059]; figures 7-11 *; | [A]JP2007266200 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2002018797 (NISSHIN SPINNING) [A] 1-10 | International search | [Y]JP2009142081 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPS6179505U (ROHM CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2007142002 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2007166888 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |