EP2465677 - DECORATIVE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamato Grand Co., Ltd. 2-4 Kaminagoya 4-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0025 / JP | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI, Shogo c/o YAMATO GRAND CO. LTD. 2-4 Kaminagoya 4-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0025 / JP | 02 /
KOSHIHARA, Atsushi c/o YAMATO GRAND CO. LTD. 2-4 Kaminagoya 4-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0025 / JP | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09848249.0 | 19.10.2009 | WO2009JP05461 | Priority number, date | JP20090186260 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009186260 | [2012/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011018830 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465677 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B33/00, B32B27/20, B32B27/00, B32B7/00 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B33/00 (KR);
B44C3/02 (KR);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | B32B33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | DEKORBLATT | [2012/25] | English: | DECORATIVE SHEET | [2012/25] | French: | FEUILLE DECORATIVE | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | Translation filed | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 06.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05254296 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-11 * EPODOC abstract - "titanium white" * * WPI abstract *; | [X]JPH115287 (OKAMOTO IND INC) [X] 1,2,5-12 * EPODOC abstract - "white spotted pattern" * * WPI abstract *; | [X]JP2001341336 (Y E DATA INC) [X] 1,7-11 * EPODOC abstract - "white" * * WPI abstract *; | [X]JPH02120083 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1,7-12 * EPODOC abstract - "white" * * WPI abstract *; | [X]JPH04163198 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,6-12 * PAJ abstract *; | [X]JP2008139398 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,7-11 * WPI abstract - "diecoat", "gravure coat" * * EPODOC abstract * * Figure *; | [X]JPH0631862 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,7-11 * WPI abstract *; | [A]JP2005059581 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * EPODOC abstract * * WPI abstract *; | [A]JPH10264345 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * PAJ abstract * | International search | [X]JP2007220640 (POLYMATECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2006057198 (NISSHA PRINTING [JP], et al); | [X]JPH10264345 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009018434 (NAKAI MEIHAN KK); | [Y]JPH09123584 (NISSHA PRINTING); | [A]JPH04163198 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2000237390 (TAKARA CELLULOID KK) | by applicant | JP2004106490 | JPH08244174 |