EP2469923 - RADIO ACCESS NETWORK, BASE STATION, AND DATA TRANSFER METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKUBO, Hiroshi c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 02 /
SAIKI, Hirotoshi c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 03 /
SASATANI, Takumi c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 04 /
BONO, Masafumi c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09848459.5 | 21.08.2009 | WO2009JP04044 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011021256 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469923 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W36/02, H04W36/00, H04W36/38, H04W88/06 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/0058 (EP,US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,US);
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W36/023 (US);
H04W36/0235 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H04W36/02, H04W24/10, H04W36/14, H04W36/38, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | FUNKZUGANGSNETZ, BASISSTATION UND DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/26] | English: | RADIO ACCESS NETWORK, BASE STATION, AND DATA TRANSFER METHOD | [2012/26] | French: | RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS RADIO, STATION DE BASE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2012 | Translation filed | 14.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 25.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005012300 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [5]-[6],[8],[23],[37],[47]-[49],;; claim 1 *; | [XI]EP1954067 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [6],[9]-[11],[21]-[24],[27]-[29],[37]-[38],[44]-[45],[52],[94];; figures 2,6; claim 1 * [I] 4; | [A]WO2009008037 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2009028111 (CHAO YI-JU [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [5],[6],[11];; claims 1-3 *; | EP2166774 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [3],[8],[14]-[16],[19]-[20], [23]-[25],[29]-[30];; figures 3,5; claims 1-2 * | International search | [Y]JPH11146464 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2001292481 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003018658 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP); | [Y]JP2005012300 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2008022309 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2008098880 (NEC CORP) | by applicant | JP2003153327 |