EP2481547 - CONTINUOUS ROTARY INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunan China Sun Pharmaceutical Machinery Co., Ltd. No. 9 Panpan Road Economic&Technological Development Zone Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AI, Liangsheng No.9 Panpan Road Economic&Technological Development Zone Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2018/33] |
Former [2012/31] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09849688.8 | 11.11.2009 | [2018/33] | WO2009CN74903 | Priority number, date | CN200910176841 | 22.09.2009 Original published format: CN200910176841 | [2012/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011035502 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481547 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2481547 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/06, // B29K105/00, B29C45/47, B29C45/50, B29C45/64, B29C49/06, B29C45/27 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B29C45/06 (EP,US);
B29C2045/065 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76371 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C45/2725 (EP,US);
B29C45/47 (EP,US);
B29C45/5092 (EP,US);
B29C45/641 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/22] | B29C45/06, B29C45/08, B29C45/12, B29C45/26, B29C45/27, B29C49/06, // B29K105/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/31] | B29C45/06, B29C45/08, B29C45/12, B29C45/26, B29C45/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHGEHEND ROTIERENDE SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE | [2012/31] | English: | CONTINUOUS ROTARY INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE | [2012/31] | French: | MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION ROTATIVE CONTINUE | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | Translation filed | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 28.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2009 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | IE | 11.11.2018 | LU | 11.11.2018 | MT | 11.11.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | GB | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 11.11.2009 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
MT | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GB | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
MT | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GB | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
MT | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GB | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
MT | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GB | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GB | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3918864 (BRAUN DIETER) [I] 1-7 * figures 1-5 * * column 3, lines 10-63 ** column 5, lines 14-32 *; | [X]DE102007049689 (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] - [0050] , [0073] - [0079] * | International search | [Y]US3327352 (OSGOOD ROBERT W); | [Y]DE2150839 (NIBCO); | [Y]US4470796 (STROUP JOHN F [US], et al); | [Y]DE4138849 (PLANEX PROJEKTIERUNGSGESELLSCH [DE]); | [A]US5643620 (BRUN JR CHARLES J [US]); | [A]US6179605 (LITTLETON JEFFREY E [US], et al); | [Y]US2003227108 (OKERSON C ALBERT [US]) |