EP2501844 - CRYSTAL GROWTH APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axt, Inc. 4281 Technology Drive Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Weiguo 774 Dolores Avenue San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | 02 /
ELLIOT, A., Grant 3712 Ortega Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Smith, Gary John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Smith, Gary John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09850317.0 | 08.10.2009 | WO2009US60072 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011043777 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501844 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C30B11/00, C30B29/40, C30B29/48 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
C30B11/007 (EP);
C30B11/003 (EP);
C30B11/006 (EP);
C30B29/40 (EP);
C30B29/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | C30B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | KRISTALLZÜCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/39] | English: | CRYSTAL GROWTH APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2012/39] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CROISSANCE DES CRISTAUX | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/48] | Request for further processing for: | 20.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 20.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.08.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 20.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.08.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.08.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 20.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.05.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2004277266 (HITACHI CABLE) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 11,14 [I] 4-8,12,13,15; | [A]US6334897 (ASAHI TOSHIAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 11,14 * column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 2 * | [Y] - BUNGER T ET AL, "Development of a vertical gradient freeze process for low EPD GaAs substrates", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20010322), vol. 80, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0921-5107(00)00573-0, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 5 - 9, XP004234652 [Y] 11,14 * page 5, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(00)00573-0 | International search | [Y]US5116456 (NESTOR ONTARIO H [US]); | [Y]US6334897 (ASAHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6896729 (LIU XIAO GORDON [US], et al); | [Y]US2008311417 (EICHLER STEFAN [DE], et al); | [Y] - BUNGER ET AL., "Development of a vertical gradient freeze process for low EPD GaAs substrates", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B JOURNAL, vol. 80, no. 1-3, (20010322), pages 5 - 9, URL: www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=Mlmg&_imagekey=B6TXF-42TC6P2-3-H&_cdi=5589&user=108orig=search&coverDate=03%2F22%2F2001&sk=999199998&view=c&wchp=dGLzVtb-zSkzS&md5=89eef2d9bf75f6dbdalcbfe476c41fd7&ie=/sdarticle.pdt, (20091127), XP004234652 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(00)00573-0 |