EP2491813 - ELECTRIC MASCARA BRUSH THAT CAN VIBRATE AND COUNTER ROTATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitomi, Hombo 2-5-2, Kamikuratsukuri Hirano-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Huang, Jung-hui 3F.-5 No. 262 Sec. 2 Henan Rd. Situn District Taichung City, Taiwan 407 / TW | ||
For all designated states Takashima, Hideyoshi Unitbuilding 2F 1-13-29 Shimanouch Chuo-Ku, Osaka 542-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Jung-Hui 3F.-5 No. 262 Sec. 2 Henan Rd., Situn District Taichung City Taiwan 407 / CN | 02 /
TAKASHIMA, Hideyoshi Unitbuilding 2F 1-13-29, Shimanouch Chuo-Ku Osaka 542-0082 / JP | 03 /
LUO, Yun-Fa 3F.-5 No. 262 Sec. 2 Henan Rd., Situn District Taichung City Taiwan 407 / CN | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/35] | 01 /
LUO, Yun-Fa 3F.-5 No. 262 Sec. 2 Henan Rd., Situn District Taichung City Taiwan 407 / CN | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Rosenheimer Strasse 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Lang, Christian LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rosenheimerstrasse 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09850505.0 | 23.10.2009 | WO2009CN74575 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011047509 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491813 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2491813 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A46B13/02, A45D40/26 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
A46B13/001 (EP);
A45D40/265 (EP);
A46B13/02 (EP);
A46B13/023 (EP);
A45D2200/207 (EP);
A46B2200/1053 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, A46B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES MASCARABÜRSTCHEN MIT VIBRATIONS- UND GEGENDREHFUNKTION | [2012/35] | English: | ELECTRIC MASCARA BRUSH THAT CAN VIBRATE AND COUNTER ROTATE | [2012/35] | French: | BROSSE ÉLECTRIQUE À MASCARA QUI PEUT VIBRER ET TOURNER EN SENS CONTRAIRE | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2012 | Translation filed | 18.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 18.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | IT | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MK | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | SM | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.03.2015 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 03.12.2014 | |
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202009007815U (TSAI YI LI [TW]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2007094552 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]; KIM HAKCHAN [KR]; KIM JUHO [KR]) [A] 1-9 * page 4 - page 7; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2009023041 (STACHOWSKI BARBARA CAREY [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 6 - page 9; figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]JP2001327326 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [A]US2004009028 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]); | [A]EP1614367 (OREAL [FR]); | [Y]CN1992476 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]CN200983954Y (LIU JIAOHUI [CN]); | [Y]CN101374437 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) |