EP2492233 - ELEVATOR CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOKETSU, Masahiko c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09850563.9 | 20.10.2009 | [2016/02] | WO2009JP68058 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011048665 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492233 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492233 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/14, B66B5/00, B66B13/22 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
B66B13/14 (KR);
B66B13/143 (EP);
B66B13/22 (EP,KR);
B66B5/00 (KR);
B66B5/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSSTEUERUNG | [2012/35] | English: | ELEVATOR CONTROLLER | [2012/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE D'ASCENSEUR | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | Translation filed | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 27.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2009 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002003116 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH0769570 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2002003116 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN); | [Y]JPH0769570 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2003112868 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JPH05306085 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST ENG); | [A]JPH08143253 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2006298538 | JP2007230685 |