EP2491269 - HANDHELD WORKING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 EM-LPH 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 EM-LPH 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGLUND, Thomas Väderkvarnsgatan 14 S-417 03 Gothenburg / SE | 02 /
MARTINSSON, Pär Orrvägen 4 S-556 26 Jönköping / SE | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 09850641.3 | 23.10.2009 | WO2009SE51210 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011049496 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491269 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/08, B25F5/00, B25G1/01, B27B17/00, F16F7/00, B25D17/04 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B25F5/006 (EP,US);
B27B17/0033 (EP,US);
F16F1/37 (EP,US);
F16F1/3732 (EP,US);
F16F1/377 (EP,US);
F16F15/022 (EP,US);
F16F3/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | F16F15/08, B25F5/00, B25G1/01, B27B17/00, F16F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ARBEITSWERKZEUG | [2012/35] | English: | HANDHELD WORKING TOOL | [2012/35] | French: | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL À MAIN | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.2012 | 31.10.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2171045 (HILTI AG) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US6016604 (WOLF GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,17 * columns 3-6; figure - *; | [X]US2004244207 (MENZEL JOHANNES [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,13,14,17 * pages 3-5; figure - *; | [XI]DE10332522 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13,15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030]; figure - * [I] 16; | [XI]EP2082845 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0084] - [0101]; figure - *[I] 11,12 | International search | [A]JPS57146936 (SEIKO GIKEN KK); | [A]US2004178551 (MENZEL JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [A]US2005011714 (MENZEL JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [A]US2005035511 (FRIEDRICH SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) |