EP2491267 - FRICTION MATERIAL FOR BRAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Products US LLC 27300 West Eleven Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034 / US | [2022/15] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Products US LLC 27300 West Eleven Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034 / US | ||
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Products, Inc. 27300 West Eleven Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034 / US | ||
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Products, Inc. 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield, MI 48033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Vijay 2393 Oak Hill Drive Murfreesboro TN 37130 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2022/15] |
Former [2018/30] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09850674.4 | 23.10.2009 | [2018/30] | WO2009US61814 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011049575 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491267 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2491267 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2491267 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
F16D69/026 (EP);
F16D2200/0073 (EP);
F16D2200/0086 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | F16D69/02, F16D69/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | REIBUNGSMATERIAL FÜR BREMSEN | [2012/35] | English: | FRICTION MATERIAL FOR BRAKES | [2012/35] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE FRICTION POUR FREINS | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 03.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2018 | 19.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE Harguth, Alexander Bäckerstrasse 33c 81241 München / DE Opponent's representative Preu, Albert Preu, Bohlig & Partner Leopoldstrasse 11 a D-80802 München / DE | 02
25.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE VRI-Verband der Reibbelagindustrie e.V. Robert-Perthel-Str. 49 50739 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE Harguth, Alexander Bäckerstrasse 33c 81241 München / DE Opponent's representative Preu, Albert Preu, Bohlig & Partner Leopoldstrasse 11 a D-80802 München / DE | ||
02
25.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE VRI-Verband der Reibbelagindustrie e.V. Robert-Perthel-Str. 49 50739 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | 15.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.09.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.11.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.03.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1722/21 | 30.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 25.11.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 23.10.2018 | LU | 23.10.2018 | MT | 23.10.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GB | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5098758 (KANI HARUNOBU [JP]) [A] 1-8,10-13 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2000345142 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * [I] 3,4,12,13; | [XI]US6534565 (GARDNER THOMAS HALEY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * claims 1-10,18,20,21 * [I] 4; | [A]EP1441143 (AKEBONO CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,10-13* the whole document * | International search | [A]KR0149747B (SUK JIN YANG [KR], et al); | [A]US2002033315 (YAMANE TAKESHI [JP]); | [A]US2004140167 (SHAO XINMING [US], et al); | [A]KR20080002748U (LEE JIN HA) | Examination | EP1081406 | US2002012783 | US2004164438 | US2006151268 | Opposition | US5339931 | US2001025064 | US2001027073 | EP1273819 | US2005014862 | US2008156226 | US5336931 | JPH06303185 | JP2001311071 | US2002033315 | JP2002241737 | US2002169231 | JP2004204904 | JP2005009620 | US2006151268 | US2020014862 | - FEMFM and VRI joint meetings |