EP2476291 - HUB BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Jie@c/o Huawei Technologies Co.Ltd., Int.Prop.Dept. B1-3A, Bantian Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09850737.9 | 30.10.2009 | WO2009CN74724 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011050531 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476291 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00, H04W84/04 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H04W84/047 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
H01Q25/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | H04W92/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | HUB-BASISSTATION | [2012/29] | English: | HUB BASE STATION | [2012/29] | French: | STATION DE BASE À CONCENTRATEUR | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2018 | 17.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14] | 22.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5889494 (REUDINK MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 19-25 * * column 2, lines 42-50 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 7 ** column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 5 *; | [XI]WO2004073114 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - page 4, line 19 * * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 28 * * page 11, lines 11-26 * * figures 1,2a,2b; claims 1-4,14,18,24-27 * [I] 7,8,11,12; | [XI]WO2007133911 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 6-31 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 31 * * page 6, line 20 - page 9, line 25 * * page 11, line 7 - page 13, line 7 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 15 * * page 17, line 31 - page 18, line 5 * * figures 5-8 * [I] 4,5 | International search | [X]WO2007106652 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [A]US2006194616 (WILLINS BRUCE A [US], et al); | [A]CN101365185 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]WO2004023665 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) | Examination | WO2009014764 | by applicant | WO2007133911 | WO2004073114 |