EP2501751 - PHOSPHATE-GROUP CONTAINING RESIN AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elementis Specialties, Inc. 469 Old Trenton Road East Windsor, New Jersey 08512 / US | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Chih-Hung No. 178, Yingtao Road Yingge Township Taipei Country 239 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Hsuan-Wan 2F, No. 3 Ln. 224 Fugang Street Shilin Distict Taipei City Taiwan 111 / CN | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Held, Stephan Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Held, Stephan Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Chemistry Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09851345.0 | 16.11.2009 | WO2009US64559 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011059454 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501751 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501751 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/49, C08F30/02, C09C3/10, C09D5/36, C09D7/12, C09C1/64, C09D5/02, C08G63/692 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C08G63/6928 (EP,US);
C09C1/644 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
C09D5/028 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1058 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | C08K5/49, C08F30/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZ MIT EINER PHOSPHATGRUPPE UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2012/39] | English: | PHOSPHATE-GROUP CONTAINING RESIN AND USE THEREOF | [2012/39] | French: | RÉSINE À TENEUR EN GROUPE PHOSPHATE ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 06.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2009 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | GB | 16.11.2015 | IE | 16.11.2015 | LU | 16.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | NL | 01.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NL | 01.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NL | 01.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NL | 01.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NL | 01.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/44] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NL | 01.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03008508 (UCB SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 21, line 22 - page 30, line 12; examples 4, 13; claims 4, 18 *; | [AD]US6617409 (YUKAWA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-14* column 6, line 5 - column 11, line 41; examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [A]WO2008044583 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 65, line 23 - page 77, line 5; examples Preparation example 15, 20, Example 16; tables 2, 3 * | International search | [X]US6099968 (HARAKAWA HIROMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2009131584 (TERAO WATARU [JP], et al) |