EP2447498 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/13] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINOMURA, Shigeki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SHINTANI, Osamu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
FURUKOSHI, Taro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
KOMADA, Atsushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/13] |
Former [2012/18] | 01 /
KINOMURA, Shigeki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
SHINTANI, Osamu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
FURUKOSHI, Taro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
KOMADA, Atsushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09851869.9 | 04.12.2009 | WO2009JP70427 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011067861 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447498 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447498 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F16K31/68 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F01P7/167 (EP,US);
G05D23/1921 (EP,US);
F01P2025/32 (EP,US);
F01P2070/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2012/18] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2012/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR VÉHICULE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | Translation filed | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2009 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | GB | 04.12.2014 | IE | 04.12.2014 | LU | 04.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 04.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10223686 (BEHR THERMOT TRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0046] - [0051] * * figure - * | International search | [X]JP2005188327 (AISIN SEIKI); | [Y]JP2008133772 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2009150364 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2009115075 |