EP2519899 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DATA STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITZ, Simon Chapmansgatan 4 S-112 36 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
BJÖRK, Jonas Grubbens Gata 9 S-112 32 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
LIDSTRÖM, Mattias Kungsholms Kyrkoplan 3A S-112 24 Stockholm / SE | [2012/48] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
MORITZ, Simon Johan Enbergs väg 38 B S-171 61 Solna / SE | ||
02 /
BJÖRK, Jonas Grubbens Gata 9 S-112 32 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
LIDSTRÖM, Mattias Kungsholms Kyrkoplan 3A S-112 24 Stockholm / SE | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Egrelius, Fredrik Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista Device, Service & Media Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09852855.7 | 29.12.2009 | WO2009SE51511 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011081580 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519899 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/289 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DATENSPEICHERUNG | [2012/45] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DATA STORAGE | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2008120334 (ETGAR RAN); | [X]GB2422924 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT EUROPE); | [X]US2007112818 (SASTRY NISHANTH); | [X]US2004122825 (PULASKI DAVID A) |