EP2209314 - Method and system for data processing in a device with integrated set-top-box and femtocell functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hou, Victor T. 8619 Villa Mallorca, Unit F La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
Chen, Sherman (Xuemin) Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | 03 /
Abraham, Charles 25220 Quail Ridge Road Los Gatos, GA 95033 / US | 04 /
Diab, Wael William 1425 Vallejo Street, Apt. 305 San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 05 /
Erceg, Vinko 167 Mozart Avenue Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 06 /
Karaoguz, Jeyhan 15 Petria Irvine, CA 90602 / US | 07 /
Kent, Mark 707 California Oaks Drive Vista, CA 92081 / US | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000180.9 | 11.01.2010 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | US20090355377 | 16.01.2009 Original published format: US 355377 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209314 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N5/00, H04W88/10 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/2143 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/4367 (US);
H04N21/4381 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N21/440218 (EP,US);
H04N21/4516 (US);
H04N21/4532 (US);
H04N21/8547 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Datenverarbeitung in einer Vorrichtung mit integriertem Digitalempfänger und Femtozellen-Funktion | [2010/29] | English: | Method and system for data processing in a device with integrated set-top-box and femtocell functionality | [2010/29] | French: | Procédé et système pour le traitement de données dans un dispositif avec fonctionnalité integrée d'un boîtier decodeur et d'une femtocellule | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/07] | Appeal following examination | 21.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0798/14 | 24.03.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2381158 (VODAFONE LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * figure 3 * * page 6 - page 7 * [Y] 5,6; | [YA]EP1775935 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [Y] 6 * figures 1, 3-7 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * [A] 1-5,7-10; | [A]EP1786222 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] *; | [YA] - Dimitri Rubin, Todd Young, "Femtocells - Bringing Reliable Location and Timing Indoors", InsideGNSS, vol. 3, no. 7, (20081029), pages 40 - 46, URL: http://www.insidegnss.com/auto/fall08-rubin.pdf, (20100406), XP002576476 [Y] 5 * figures 4, 5 * * table 2 * * page 42, column 2 - page 43, column 2 * * page 44, column 2 - page 45, column 1 * [A] 1-4,6-10 | [A] - picoChip, "The Case for Home Basestations", (20080930), pages 1 - 22, URL: http://www.picochip.com/assets/downloads/femtocell_wp.pdf, (20101006), XP002576477 [A] 1-10 * page 11 - page 15 * * figure 10 * | Examination | WO2005051022 |