EP2216053 - Sterilization case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symmetry Medical, Inc. 220 West Market Street Warsaw IN 46582 / US | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sands, Daniel L. 1199 N. 175 E. Warsaw Indiana 46582 / US | 02 /
Shoemaker, Jon D. 26 Ems T7 Lane Leesburg Indiana 46538 / US | 03 /
Lamar, Chad M. 525 Smokey Row Ct. Carmel Indiana 46033 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | [2010/32] | Application number, filing date | 10000204.7 | 18.04.2006 | [2010/32] | Priority number, date | US20050150391 | 09.06.2005 Original published format: US 150391 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2216053 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2216053 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2216053 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, A61B19/02 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
A61B50/31 (EP,US);
A61B50/34 (EP,US);
A61B2050/185 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3007 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3009 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3011 (EP,US);
A61B2050/311 (EP,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | Sterilisationsbehälter | [2010/32] | English: | Sterilization case | [2010/32] | French: | Recipient de sterilisation | [2011/33] |
Former [2010/32] | Recipient de sterilisation | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 06.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06750463.9 / EP1888416 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060750463) is 10.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2006 | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | LU | 18.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3752547 (PROPST R, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 7 - line 29; figures 5,11,13,14 *; | [A]US5125697 (KAHL W HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [I]US2004129595 (DANE GARY T [US], et al) [I] 1,7,9 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0030]; figures 1,2,5; claims 16,17 * |