EP2211032 - Heating systems to prevent freezing of condensation in breather tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC 4201 Winfield Road Warrenville IL 60555 / US | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cattani, Luis Carlos 1163 Shoreline Drive Aurora, IL 60504 / US | 02 /
Dickerson, Steven J. 2940 Banbury lane Lake in the Hills, IL 60156 / US | 03 /
Medynskyi, Doug 1830 N. 74th Avenue Elmwood Park, IL 60707 / US | 04 /
Beatty, Scott A. 1 North Beacon Place, No. 608 La Grange, IL 60525 / US | 05 /
Stobnicki, Andrew 425 Milford Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | 06 /
Zielke, Martin R. 14203 S. King Road Lockport, IL 60441 / US | 07 /
Goettemoller, Paul 12209 South 93rd Avenue Palos Heights, IL 60464 / US | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000227.8 | 12.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | US20090147629P | 27.01.2009 Original published format: US 147629 P | US20090541467 | 14.08.2009 Original published format: US 541467 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2211032 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2211032 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/04 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
F01M13/04 (EP,US);
F01M2013/0455 (EP,US);
F01M2013/0472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Heizsysteme zur Verhinderung des Einfrierens von Schwitzwasser in Entlüftungsrohren | [2010/30] | English: | Heating systems to prevent freezing of condensation in breather tubes | [2010/30] | French: | Systèmes de chauffage pour empêcher la congélation de condensation dans des tubes de respiration | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5870409U (-) [X] 1-3,12-14,17-19 * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]JPS61171814 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,12,17,18 * figure 1 * [I] 2,6-8,11,13,16,20; | [X]US4768493 (OHTAKA SHOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,12,14,17-19 * figures 1-11 *; | [X]JPH0493710U (-) [X] 1,2,5,12,13,15,17,20 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6412479 (CANFIELD JAMES CARL [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,12,17,18,20* figures 1-8 * | Examination | US2006162325 | by applicant | US7185643 |