EP2213958 - Calorific heat exchanger for heating service water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hertgers, Christiaan Almenseweg 63 7218 MD Almen / NL | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/31] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000454.8 | 19.01.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | AT20090000140 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: AT 1402009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2213958 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2213958 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213958 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/43, F24H8/00 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
F24H1/43 (EP);
F24H8/00 (EP);
F24H8/006 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Brennwert-Wärmetauscher für Brauchwassererwärmung | [2010/31] | English: | Calorific heat exchanger for heating service water | [2010/31] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à valeur énergétique pour le chauffage de l'eau non potable | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 09.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | IE | 19.01.2018 | LU | 19.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE3307330 (VIESSMANN HANS) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 2; | [Y]EP1884722 (BOMAT HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * |