EP2360700 - Electrical conduit, in particular a high voltage energy cable or high frequency cable with a large conduit cross-section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waskönig+Walter Hochspannungskabel GmbH & Co. KG Ostermoorstrasse 143 26683 Saterland / DE | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waskönig, Jörg Woltersdamm 9 26655 Westerstede / DE | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [2014/10] |
Former [2011/34] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000958.8 | 30.01.2010 | [2011/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360700 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/30 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
H01B7/306 (EP);
H01B13/0278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrischer Leiter, insbesondere ein Hochspannungs-Energiekabel oder Hochfrequenz-Kabel mit einem grossen Leiterquerschnitt | [2011/34] | English: | Electrical conduit, in particular a high voltage energy cable or high frequency cable with a large conduit cross-section | [2011/34] | French: | Conducteur électrique, notamment un câble d'énergie haute tension ou câble haute fréquence doté d'une grande section conductrice | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/05] | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2008262712 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1-4,6,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0021] - [0024] - [0030] - [0033] - [0036] - [0038]; figures 1,2,3,5 * [I] 5,7,9; | [XI]US2412196 (ASHBAUGH ROBERT P, et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, lines 1-37 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,7-9; | [A]GB415294 (HUMPHREYS MILLIKEN, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH08148038 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 33, Database accession no. 1996-326380, XP002582578 & JPH08148038 A 19960607 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - New England Wire Technologies, "Litz Wire Types & Construction", (2005), URL: http://www.newenglandwire.com/catalog/page129-litz-winding_wires-litz_wire_types-type_1-type_2-type_3-type_4-type_5-type_6-type_7-type_8.htm, (20100517), XP002582579 [A] 1 * the whole document * |