EP2319842 - Fluorescent carbazole compounds for cancer diagnosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Academia Sinica 128, Sec. 2 Academia Sinica Road Nan-Kang Taipei 115 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Academia Sinica 128, Sec. 2 Academia Sinica Road Nan-Kang Taipei 115 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Ta-Chau IAMS Academia Sinica P.O. Box 23-166 Taipei / TW | 02 /
Cho, Chih-Chien 5F, No. 13, Fong 1 st Ln., Fongian St. Sinjhuang City Taipei County 242 / TW | 03 /
Chang, Cheng-Chung Graduate Institute of Biomedical Engineering National Chung-Hsing University 250, Kuo Kuang Road Taichung / TW | 04 /
Kang, Chi-Chih No. 10, Ln.33 Yongpu St. Yongkang City Tainan County 710 / TW | 05 /
Wang, Zi-Fu 11F-2, No.9, Ln.11 Liyuan 1st St. Linkou Township Taipei County 244 / TW | [2014/15] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Chang, Ta-Chau IAMS Academia Sinica P.O. Box 23-166 Taipei / TW | ||
02 /
Cho, Chih-Chien 5F, No. 13, Fong 1 st Ln., Fongian St. Sinjhuang City Taipei County 242 / TW | |||
03 /
Chang, Cheng-Chung Graduate Institute of Biomedical Engineering National Chung-Hsing University 250, Kuo Kuang Road Taichung / TW | |||
04 /
Kang, Chi-Chih No. 10, Ln.33, Yongpu St. Yongkang City Tainan County 710 / TW | |||
05 /
Wang, Zi-Fu 11F-2, No.9, Ln.11 Liyuan 1st St. Linkou Township Taipei County 244 / TW | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Storz, Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001388.7 | 10.02.2010 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20090613770 | 06.11.2009 Original published format: US 613770 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319842 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319842 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C09K11/06, G01N21/64 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | Fluoreszierende Carbazolverbindungen zur Krebsdiagnose | [2011/19] | English: | Fluorescent carbazole compounds for cancer diagnosis | [2011/19] | French: | Composants de carbazole fluorescent pour le diagnostic de cancer | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2010 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | HR | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MK | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | SM | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | NO | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.02.2010 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007098233 (CHANG TA-CHAU [TW], et al) [I] 1-7,10-15 * Paragraphs [0004], [0006], [0009] * [A] 8,9,16; | [A]US2005090671 (CHANG TA-CHAU [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - ZHOU H P ET AL, "Crystal structures, optical properties and theoretical calculation of novel two-photon polymerization initiators", CHEMICAL PHYSICS, NORTH-HOLLAND LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CHEMPHYS.2005.09.045, vol. 322, no. 3, ISSN 0301-0104, (20060320), pages 459 - 470, (20060320), XP025050758 [X] 1-7,13-15 * compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemphys.2005.09.045 | Examination | - BARBACCI ET AL., "Cellular Membrane Phospholipids Act as a Depository for Quaternary Amine Containing Drugs thus Competing with the Acetylcholine/Nicotinic Receptor", J. PROTEOME RES., (20120601), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 3382 - 3389 | by applicant | US2005249669 | US6979738 | US2007098233 | - SOMA ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (1998), vol. 102, pages 6152 - 6160 | - KANG ET AL., J CHIN. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 52, pages 1069 - 1072 | - KANG ET AL., ANALYST, (2007), vol. 132, pages 745 - 749 | - ENGELMANN, INT. J. PHARM., (2007), vol. 329, pages 12 - 18 |