EP2248502 - Standing aid for people [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gockel-Böhner, Doris Ziegelhaus 5 91601 Dombühl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Gockel-Böhner, Doris Ziegelhaus 5 91601 Dornbühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gockel-Böhner, Hubert Ziegelhaus 5 91601 Dombühl / DE | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Sven Hendrik Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Schmidt, Sven Hendrik Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Schmidt, Sven Hendrik Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001446.3 | 12.02.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20091019716 | 05.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009019716 | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2248502 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2248502 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248502 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
A61G7/1023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Aufrichthilfe für Personen | [2010/45] | English: | Standing aid for people | [2010/45] | French: | Dispositif d'aide au levage pour personnes | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2010 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | HR | 09.05.2012 | LT | 09.05.2012 | LV | 09.05.2012 | MK | 09.05.2012 | MT | 09.05.2012 | NL | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | SM | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | NO | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | ES | 20.08.2012 | IS | 09.09.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 09.05.2012 | |
NO | 09.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5896859 (CARROLL JOHN D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002026667 (BERRY TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0243642 (NYGREN BERIT [SE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |