EP2221948 - Linear actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saia-Burgess Dresden GmbH Wilhelm-Liebknecht-Strasse 6 01257 Dresden / DE | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Thomas Krenkelstrasse 8 01309 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Kurtz, Andreas Am Denkmal 6 01768 Glashütte / DE | 03 /
Bachmann, Klaus Hauptstrasse 38 DE- 01640 Coswig / DE | [2017/49] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Müller, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Krenkelstrasse 8 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
Kurtz, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Am Denkmal 6 01768 Glashütte / DE | |||
03 /
Bachmann, Klaus Hauptstrasse 38 DE- 01640 Coswig / DE | Representative(s) | Hecker, Roland Christoph, et al Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Tolkewitzer Straße 22 01277 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Grüneberg, Marcus, et al Voigt & Grüneberg Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft August-Bebel-Strasse 39 04416 Markkleeberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Grüneberg, Marcus, et al Voigt & Grüneberg Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Dresdner Straße 70 04317 Leipzig / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Grüneberg, Marcus Voigt & Grüneberg Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Prager Strasse 34 04317 Leipzig / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001508.0 | 15.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | DE20091010085 | 24.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009010085 | [2010/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221948 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221948 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221948 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/06, H02K5/15 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
H02K5/15 (EP,US);
H02K5/1735 (EP,US);
H02K7/06 (EP,US);
H02K1/145 (EP,US);
H02K1/185 (EP,US);
H02K37/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | H02K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2010/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Linear-Aktuator | [2010/34] | English: | Linear actuator | [2010/34] | French: | Actionneur linéaire | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 28.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | MT | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | AT | 15.02.2018 | IE | 15.02.2018 | LU | 15.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GB | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
AT | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
AT | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
AT | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
AT | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19823177 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1237255 (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0005]; figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]EP1496600 (SAIA BURGESS DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0031]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1513243 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] - [0015]; figures 1-6 * |