EP2292187 - Growth prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/10] | Growth prosthetic | ||
[2011/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wittenstein AG Walter-Wittenstein-Strasse 1 97999 Igersheim / DE | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stauch, Roman Rengershäuser Strasse 38 97959 Assamstadt / DE | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Arat, Dogan, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Arat, Dogan, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzleien Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002117.9 | 02.03.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | DE20091011661 | 04.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009011661 | [2011/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2292187 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2292187 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292187 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36, A61F2/48 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/3607 (EP,US);
A61F2/482 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30087 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30523 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30601 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Wachstumsprothese | [2011/10] | English: | Growth prosthesis | [2011/49] | French: | Prothèse de croissance | [2011/10] |
Former [2011/10] | Growth prosthetic | Examination procedure | 26.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 06.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2010 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | HR | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | MK | 23.05.2012 | MT | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | SM | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | NO | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MK | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
SM | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
SM | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | |
NO | 23.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1611868 (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-15 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] * [Y] 7-9; | [Y]US5626579 (MUSCHLER GEORGE F [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * column 4, lines 15-19 * * column 7, lines 52-55 * | by applicant | EP0776432 | EP1371346 | DE19906423 |