EP2239000 - System for measuring components in a living body, kit for a micropore forming device, and marking member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asakura, Yoshihiro c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
Asakura, Yoshihiro 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002254.0 | 04.03.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | JP20090060369 | 13.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009060369 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2239000 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2239000 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/42, A61B5/15, A61B5/00 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150969 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zum Messen von Komponenten in einem lebenden Körper, Kit für eine Vorrichtung zum Bilden von Mikroporen und Markierungselement | [2010/41] | English: | System for measuring components in a living body, kit for a micropore forming device, and marking member | [2010/41] | French: | Système pour mesurer les composants dans un corps vivant, kit pour dispositif de formation de micropore, et élément de marquage | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1092390 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-11,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094]; figures 1A-6, 16 * [Y] 5,6,12-14; | [Y]US2007027429 (KURACINA THOMAS C [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0172]; figures 5-8 *; | [Y]WO2008147347 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040]; figures 4, 5 *; | [A]EP1834589 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003113827 | US2007233011 |