EP2229007 - An apparatus for processing an audio signal and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Hyen-O Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | 02 /
Favrot, Alex Kirchbergstrasse 30 5023 Biberstein / CH | 03 /
Faller, Christof Rue du Centre 44B 1025 St. Sulpice / CH | 04 /
Lee, Myung Hoon Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | 05 /
Moon, Jong Ha Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2013/52] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Oh, Hyen-O Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc., 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | ||
02 /
Favrot, Alex Kirchbergstrasse 30 5023 Biberstein / CH | |||
03 /
Faller, Christof Rue du Centre 44B 1025 St. Sulpice / CH | |||
04 /
Lee, Myung Hoon Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc., 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | |||
05 /
Moon, Jong Ha Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc., 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-724 / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002391.0 | 08.03.2010 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | US20090158388P | 08.03.2009 Original published format: US 158388 P | US20090164459P | 29.03.2009 Original published format: US 164459 P | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2229007 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2229007 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/04, H03G9/00, H03G9/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H03G9/025 (EP,US);
H03G9/005 (EP,US);
G10L21/0208 (US);
H03G1/02 (US);
H03G3/001 (US);
H03G5/165 (US);
H03G7/002 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/37] | H04R3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung eines Audiosignals und Verfahren dafür | [2010/37] | English: | An apparatus for processing an audio signal and method thereof | [2010/37] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'un signal audio et son procédé | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 06.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2010 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 08.03.2014 | LU | 08.03.2014 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4739514 (SHORT WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * column 5, line 5 - line 68; figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO2006106479 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * page 4, line 4 - line 14 * * page 8, line 11 - line 21 * * page 10, line 14 - line 21 * * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 14; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO0221687 (HARMAN INT IND [US], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4,7 * |