EP2233063 - Bending instrument for an endoscope and endoscope set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funamura, Shigeaki c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | 02 /
Satoh, Takashi c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | 03 /
Yokoyama, Masatoshi c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | [2016/06] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Funamura, Shigeaki c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
Satoh, Takashi c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
Yokoyama, Masatoshi c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Olsson, Carl H.S. Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2016/06] |
Former [2010/39] | Olsson, Carl H.S. Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 10002474.4 | 10.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | JP20090071679 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009071679 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233063 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233063 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61B1/0056 (EP);
A61B1/00089 (EP);
A61B1/00096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Instrument de pliage pour endoscope et ensemble endoscope | [2015/30] | English: | Bending instrument for an endoscope and endoscope set | [2010/39] | French: | Biegeinstrument für ein Endoskop und Endoskopsatz | [2015/30] |
Former [2010/39] | Biegeinstrument für ein Endoskop und Endoskopsatz | ||
Former [2010/39] | Instrument de pliage pour endoscope et ensemble endoscope | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 18.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | IE | 10.03.2016 | LU | 10.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
MT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
MT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003014037 (THOMPSON RUSSELL B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0164]; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]JP2001120496 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0609182 (XTRODE SRL [IT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US6099464 (SHIMIZU YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2001120496 | US2003014037 |