EP2256650 - Mobile terminal and method for displaying on a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Min, Ho 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ho, Joon 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | [2013/26] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Lee, Min, Ho 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Ho, Joon 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002883.6 | 18.03.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | KR20090046828 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: KR 20090046828 | KR20090046904 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: KR 20090046904 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256650 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256650 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06K9/22, G06K9/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H04N5/59 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Tragbares Endgerät und Verfahren zur Anzeige auf einem tragbaren Endgerät | [2010/48] | English: | Mobile terminal and method for displaying on a mobile terminal | [2010/48] | French: | Terminal mobile et procédé d'affichage sur un terminal mobile | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 15.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2010 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | HR | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | MK | 30.10.2013 | MT | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | SM | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | NO | 30.01.2014 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | IE | 18.03.2014 | LU | 18.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | |
NO | 30.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1965344 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH]) [X] 1,8,9,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-7; claims 1-26 * [A] 2-7,10-14; | [XP]US2009237546 (BLOEBAUM L SCOTT [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-7; claims 1-20 *; | [A]WO2008107976 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AP]US2010033430 (KAKUTANI KOICHIRO [JP], et al) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102006000556 (TINGDEDONG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1965344 | WO2008107976 |