EP2248688 - Towing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehau AG & Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Peter Wirthstrasse 104 95028 Hof / DE | 02 /
Wendel, Bettina Happurger Str. 12 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Michel, Peter Wirthstrasse 104 95028 Hof / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002977.6 | 20.03.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20092006554U | 07.05.2009 Original published format: DE 202009006554 U | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248688 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248688 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/14, B60D1/145 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
B60D1/485 (EP);
B60D1/145 (EP);
B60D1/243 (EP);
B60D1/488 (EP);
B60D1/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Abschleppvorrichtung | [2010/45] | English: | Towing device | [2010/45] | French: | Dispositif de remorquage | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2010 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MK | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | SM | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | GB | 20.03.2014 | IE | 20.03.2014 | LU | 20.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.03.2010 | |
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.03.2010 | |
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202007007313U (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-13,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 10,14; | [X]EP0160934 (JURGENS WALTER DR ING) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * page 4, line 105 - page 6, line 155 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE3703626 (JUERGENS WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,11,12,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102007001969 (FAC FRANK ABELS CONSULT & TECH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,11-13,15 * paragraph [0006] * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3416631 (JUERGENS WALTER) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE4441460 (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2006050558 (MATHEWS CIVIL AND ASPHALT PTY [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,12,15 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 28 * * figures 3,5,6 *; | [X]DE10164413 (KREUZIGER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005056578 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0018]; figure - * | by applicant | DE19902478 | DE10051323 |