EP2233139 - Minoxidil aqueous composition containing bile acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Ritsuko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
Kanazawa, Katsuhiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Morita, Ritsuko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Kanazawa, Katsuhiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/16] |
Former [2010/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003003.0 | 22.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | JP20090069887 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009069887 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233139 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233139 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K47/12, A61K47/42, A61K9/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/4953 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Minoxidil-Zusammensetzung, die Gallensäure enthält | [2010/39] | English: | Minoxidil aqueous composition containing bile acid | [2010/39] | French: | Composition aqueuse de minoxydil contenant de l'acide biliaire | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2010 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.03.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9953923 (SOLTEC RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * page 2, line 23 * * page 5, lines 3-8 * * example 1 * [Y] 3-5,9; | [X]US2002031558 (YOO SEO HONG [US]) [X] 1,3,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0045] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0089] * * claims 1,48,52 *; | [Y]WO2006057637 (YOO SEO HONG [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007074476 (DABUR PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 17, lines 11,12 * * claims 66,68,74 * * page 38, lines 24,25 * * page 39, lines 3-6 * | Examination | US5030442 | by applicant | US3461461 | US4139619 | US4596812 | JPH1174355 |