EP2246457 - Method for roughening a metal surface, in particular a cylinder wall of a crankcase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2017/49] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagener, Wolfram, Dr. Hegenbergstraße 16 34305 Niedenstein / DE | 02 /
Bartholomie, Georg Taubenstraße 3 84100 Niederaichbach / DE | [2010/44] | Application number, filing date | 10003319.0 | 27.03.2010 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | DE20091019674 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009019674 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246457 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2246457 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C23C4/02 (EP);
C23F1/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2010/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufrauhen einer Metalloberfläche, insbesondere einer Zylinderwandung eines Kurbelgehäuses | [2010/44] | English: | Method for roughening a metal surface, in particular a cylinder wall of a crankcase | [2010/44] | French: | Procédé de dépolissage d'une surface métallique, notamment d'une paroi cylindrique d'un carter | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 28.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2010 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | MT | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | AT | 27.03.2018 | IE | 27.03.2018 | LU | 27.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.03.2010 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 27.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.03.2010 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 27.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 27.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 27.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 27.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 27.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0202845 (CATERPILLAR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 23; claims 1-13 * [I] 6; | [A]DE102004038176 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0038]; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | WO0202845 | EP0568315 | US5626674 | US5380564 |