EP2221839 - Niobium powder, sintered body and capacitor using the body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omori, Kazuhiro SHOWA DENKO K.K. Central Research Laboratory 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Naito, Kazumi SHOWA DENKO K.K. Central Research Laboratory 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2013/41] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Omori, Kazuhiro SHOWA DENKO K.K. Central Research Laboratory 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Naito, Kazumi SHOWA DENKO K.K. Central Research Laboratory 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2017/21] |
Former [2013/41] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003488.3 | 09.08.2001 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | JP20000243486 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000243486 | JP20000384720 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000384720 | JP20010065852 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001065852 | JP20010174018 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001174018 | [2010/34] | Previously filed application, date | EP20010955623 | 09.08.2001 | [2010/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221839 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221839 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221839 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2221839 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/052, H01G9/042, C22C1/04 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H01G9/0525 (EP,US);
H01G9/042 (KR);
C22C1/045 (EP);
H01G9/028 (EP);
B22F2998/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/145, B22F1/148 (KR,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2010/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Niobpulver, gesinterter Körper und Kondensator mit dem Körper | [2010/34] | English: | Niobium powder, sintered body and capacitor using the body | [2010/34] | French: | Poudre de niobium, corps fritté et condensateur utilisant le corps | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01955623.2 / EP1324359 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010955623) is 05.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE H.C. Starck GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE H.C. Starck GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE Opponent's representative Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 18.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.06.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.04.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | GB | 09.08.2014 | IE | 09.08.2014 | LU | 09.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | FR | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 09.08.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 09.08.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 09.08.2014 | ||
IE | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
GB | 09.08.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19847012 (STARCK H C GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 52 ** page 5, lines 50-60; table Tabelle 2 * | Opposition | GB1162709 | GB1283689 | US5448447 | US5729428 | WO9819811 | WO9849356 | JP2000243486 | WO0056486 | WO0067936 | EP1093137 | WO0126852 | DE19953946 | EP1202301 | EP1204126 | - GUPTA C.K. ET AL, "Preparation of high purity niobium", JOURNAL OF THE LESS-COMMON METALS, (19880401), vol. 139, pages 189 - 202 | - KAMAT G.R. ET AL, "Open Aluminothermic Reduction of Columbium (Nb) Pentoxide and Purification of the Reduced Metal", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS, (197110), vol. 2, pages 2817 - 2823 | - HÖRMANN M., "Production of High Thermal Conductivity Niobium on a technical scale for High-Frequency Superconductivity", JOURNAL OF THE LESS-COMMON METALS, (198804), vol. 139, no. 1, pages 1 - 14 | - SCHWARTZ N., "Niobium Solid Electrolytic Capacitors", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (196108), vol. 108, no. 8, pages 750 - 758 | - HD 403279, Kemet Department Linde Company, Progress Report Third Quarter, 01.01.1963 - 31.03.1963 | - GROENENDAAL L.B. ET AL, "Poly(3,4-ethylendioxythiophene) and Its Derivatives: Past, Present, and Future**", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 481 - 494 | - BOWEN P., "Particle Size Distribution Measurement from Millimeters to Nanometers and from Rods to Platelets", JOURNAL OF DISPERSION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 631 - 662 | - ELVERS B. ET AL, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, WEINHEIM, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, (1993), vol. A23, pages 199 - 204 | - KLOBES P. ET AL, 960-17 Porosity and Specific Surface Area Measurements for Solid Materials, (20060901), pages 1 - 79 | - DIN ISO 9277 :2010, Bestimmung der spezifischen Oberfläche von Festkörpen mittels Gasdsorbtion - BET - Verfahren |