EP2241700 - Dowel for connecting concrete panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich, Thomas Rebschulweg 14 54470 Bernkastel-Kues / DE | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003730.8 | 07.04.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | DE20091016691 | 07.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009016691 | [2010/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2241700 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2241700 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2241700 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/18 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
E04C5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Betondübel zur Verbindung von Betonschalen | [2010/42] | English: | Dowel for connecting concrete panels | [2010/42] | French: | Cheville pour la connexion de panneaux en beton | [2016/25] |
Former [2010/42] | cheville pour la connexion de panneaux en beton | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2010 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | GB | 07.04.2017 | IE | 07.04.2017 | LU | 07.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.04.2010 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.04.2010 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2004099520 (NILSEN CHRISTOPHER [SE]) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * page 9, line 31 - page 11, line 23; figures 7a, 7b, 14 * [A] 4,8,9; | [Y]US2334369 (YANKEE RALPH D) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * page 3, column linke, paragraph 27; figures 1,4,7 *; | [Y]CH683933 (TEGOMA AG CHUR) [Y] 11 * figures 3,3a,4,7,8 *; | [A]DE29613627U (DEGEN PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |