EP2256578 - Low-dropout voltage regulator with low quiescent current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Grenoble 2) SAS 12, rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Grenoble 2) SAS 12, Rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renous, Claude 2 Bis Rue des Violettes 38100 Grenoble / FR | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 10004211.8 | 21.04.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | FR20090002363 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0902363 | [2010/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256578 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Low-dropout Spannungsregler mit niedrigem Ruhestrom | [2010/48] | English: | Low-dropout voltage regulator with low quiescent current | [2010/48] | French: | Régulateur de tension à faible tension de dechet et faible courant de repos | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4906913 (STANOJEVIC SILVO [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 62 - column 7, line 17; figure 2; claims 7-13 *; | [X]US5867015 (CORSI MARCO [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]US7312598 (HUANG SHENGMING [GB]) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]US2008191670 (ODDOART LUDOVIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0075]; figures 3-5 *; | [X] - AL-SHYOUKH M ET AL, "A Transient-Enhanced Low-Quiescent Current Low-Dropout Regulator With Buffer Impedance Attenuation", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070801), vol. 42, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1732 - 1742, XP011188648 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2007.900281 | [X] - ZUSHU YAN ET AL, "A low-voltage CMOS low-dropout regulator with novel capacitor-multiplier frequency compensation", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. ISCAS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080518), ISBN 978-1-4244-1683-7, pages 2685 - 2688, XP031392565 [X] 1-11 * page 2685 - page 2688; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2008.4542010 | [X] - GABRIEL A RINCON-MORA ET AL, "A Low-Voltage, Low Quiescent Current, Low Drop-Out Regulator", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980101), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9200, XP011060653 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - SHAN YUAN ET AL, "Low dropout voltage regulator for wireless applications", 33RD.ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. PESC 2002. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CAIRNS, QUEENSLAND, AUSTRALIA, JUNE 23 - 27, 2002; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020623), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7262-7, pages 421 - 424, XP010747488 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - MOHAMMAD AL-SHYOUKH ET AL, "A Transient-Enhanced 20 A-Quiescent 200mA-Load Low-Dropout Regulator With Buffer Impedance Attenuation", CONFERENCE 2006, IEEE CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0075-1, pages 615 - 618, XP031052546 [X] 1-11 * page 615 - page 618; figure 3 * |