EP2256778 - Electric switching device with a thermal actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmer, Klaus Weiherstrasse 9 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 02 /
Weber, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Wieblinger Weg 52 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Orban, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 106/1 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 10004302.5 | 22.04.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | DE20091023557 | 30.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009023557 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256778 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256778 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256778 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/16, H01H71/08, H01H71/40 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
H01H71/16 (EP);
H01H71/08 (EP);
H01H71/40 (EP);
H01H71/145 (EP);
H01H71/52 (EP);
H01H71/7427 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | H01H71/16, H01H71/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Schaltgerät mit einem thermischen Auslöser | [2010/48] | English: | Electric switching device with a thermal actuator | [2010/48] | French: | Commutateur électrique doté d'un déclencheur thermique | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MK | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | SM | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | LU | 22.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
SM | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
LU | 22.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4202122 (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 16 - page 4, line 62; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0616350 (MAIER & CIE C [CH]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 48 - column 7, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]US5872495 (DIMARCO BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 51 - column 9, line 67; figures 1-11 *; | [AD]DE102008006863 (ABB AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0089]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | DE102008006863 |