EP2256799 - Monolithic vertically integrated composite group III-V and group IV semiconductor device and method for fabricating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Americas Corp. 101 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states International Rectifier Corporation 233 Kansas Street El Segundo CA 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briere, Michael, A. 1097 Mendon Road Woonsocket Rhode Island 02895 / US | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10004470.0 | 28.04.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20090455117 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: US 455117 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256799 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256799 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8258, H01L27/06, H01L21/822 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H01L27/0629 (EP,US);
H01L21/8221 (EP,US);
H01L21/8258 (EP,US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L23/535 (EP,US);
H01L27/0605 (EP,US);
H01L27/0694 (EP,US);
H01L29/16 (US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
H01L29/205 (US);
H01L29/778 (US);
H01L29/7786 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (US);
H01L29/861 (US);
H01L29/872 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | H01L21/8258, H01L27/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Monolithisches, vertikal integriertes Halbleiterbauelement aus Verbundmaterial aus Materialien der Gruppe III-IV und Gruppe IV und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2010/48] | English: | Monolithic vertically integrated composite group III-V and group IV semiconductor device and method for fabricating same | [2010/48] | French: | Dispositif de semi-conducteurs de groupe III-V et de groupe IV composite intégré verticalement monolithique, et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61201456 (TDK CORP) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0106546 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 6, line 8 - page 24, line 21; figures 1A-6 *; | [Y]WO02097898 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * page 6, line 3 - page 48, line 24; figures 1-39 *; | [A]US2003140317 (BREWER PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-21* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006175633 (KINZER DANIEL M [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US6855593 | US6977208 |