EP2213206 - Patient support with pressure switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 350 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Bradley 236 Winding Way Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 02 /
Hakamiun, Reza 67 Three Pence Lane Charleston, SC 29414 / US | 03 /
Uzzle, Thomas 1512 Clarendon Way Mt. Pleasant, SC 29466 / US | 04 /
Chambers, Kenith W. 1358 Tekulve Road Batesville, IN 47006 / US | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10004540.0 | 09.11.2006 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | US20050734942P | 09.11.2005 Original published format: US 734942 P | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213206 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213206 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/08 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A61G2203/34 (EP,US);
A61G2203/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/31] | Title | German: | Liegevorrichtung für Patienten mit Drucksensor | [2010/31] | English: | Patient support with pressure switch | [2010/31] | French: | Support de patient avec capteur de pression | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06837334.9 / EP1947987 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060837334) is 08.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2135089 (HILL ROM CO INC) [X] 1,8-10,12,13 * page 1, line 103 - page 2, line 130 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03088885 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 22, line 9 - page 22, line 25 * * figure - * | by applicant | US5630238 | US5715548 | US6076208 | US6240584 | US6320510 | US6378152 | US6499167 | US4539560 | US6735799 | US20050120080 | US20050697748 | US20050697708 | US20040636252 |