EP2261060 - Motorcycle tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumamoto, Teruka Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9,Wakinohama-cho,3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2014/31] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Kumamoto, Teruka Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9,Wakinohama-cho,3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10004711.7 | 04.05.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | JP20090141343 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009141343 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2261060 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2261060 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261060 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/22 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
B60C9/22 (EP);
B60C9/2009 (EP);
B60C2200/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Motorradreifen | [2010/50] | English: | Motorcycle tire | [2010/50] | French: | Pneu de motocyclette | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2010 | AL | 30.07.2014 | AT | 30.07.2014 | BE | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MK | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | SM | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.05.2010 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MK | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 04.05.2010 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5647929 (SUZUKI SHIGEHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column 4, line 10 - line 27 * [I] 4,6; | [XI]EP0950546 (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0012] , [0055] , [0081]; figures 1,4 * [I] 4-7; | [XPI]EP2116395 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028]; figure 1 * [I] 2,4,6,7; | [XI]EP0808730 (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1,3 * page 4, lines 29-40; figures 3-4 * [I] 2,4-7 |