EP2213291 - Antisense inhibition of PTP1B expression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowsert, Lex M. 1570 Dustin Cade Drive New Braunfels, TX 78130 / US | 02 /
Wyatt, Jacqueline R. 809 Canyon Road Sundance, WY 82729 / US | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10004747.1 | 04.01.2001 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | US20000487368 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: US 487368 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213291 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/713, C12N15/88, C12N15/11, C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Y301/03048 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Antisense-Hemmung der PTP1B-Expression | [2010/31] | English: | Antisense inhibition of PTP1B expression | [2010/31] | French: | Inhibition anti-sens d'expression PTP1B | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2014 | 24.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01900829.1 / EP1250455 | EP08008871.9 / EP2003207 | Divisional application(s) | EP10176460.3 / EP2329830 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010900829) is 10.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO9732595 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [XD] 1-4,6,7 * page 9 - page 10 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 8-15; | [YD] - LEE S-R ET AL, "Reversible inactivation of protein-tyrosine phosphatase 1B in A431 cells stimulated with epidermal growth factor", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1074/JBC.273.25.15366, (19980619), vol. 273, no. 25, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15366 - 15372, XP002308665 [YD] 4,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.25.15366 | [Y] - HENRY S P ET AL, "TOXICOLOGICAL AND PHARMACOKINETIC PROPERTIES OF CHEMICALLY MODIFIED ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE INHIBITORS OF PKC-ALPHA AND C-RAF KINASE", ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (199707), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0266-9536, pages 409 - 420, XP009008948 [Y] 7-15 * the whole document * | [IDY] - ELCHEBLY MOUNIB ET AL, "Increased insulin sensitivity and obesity resistance in mice lacking the protein tyrosine phosphatase-1B gene", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (19990305), vol. 283, no. 5407, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1544 - 1548, XP002119313 [ID] 1-3,6 * abstract * * page 1547 * [Y] 7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.283.5407.1544 | [A] - CROOKE S T, "BASIC PRINCIPLES OF ANTISENSE THERAPEUTICS", ANTISENSE RESEARCH AND APPLICATIONS, CRC PRESS, GB, (19980101), pages 1 - 50, XP000900999 [A] 1-15 * page 9 - page 12 * | [A] - HASSID A ET AL, "Role of PTP-1B in aortic smooth muscle cell motility and tyrosine phosphorylation of focal adhesion proteins", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: HEART AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, THE AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, XX, (199907), vol. 277, no. 1 part 2, ISSN 0363-6135, pages H192 - H198, XP002218828 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page H193, column L * * page H197; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | US3687808 | US4426330 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4534899 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | WO8804924 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4837028 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4904582 | WO9004384 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4981957 | WO9105545 | US5013830 | US5013556 | US5023243 | US5034506 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5108921 | US5112963 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5149797 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177196 | US5177198 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5213804 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5220007 | US5223618 | US5225212 | US5227170 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5256775 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264562 | US5264564 | US5264221 | WO9324510 | US5272250 | US5276019 | US5278302 | WO9402501 | WO9402499 | US5286717 | US5292873 | EP0445131 | US5317098 | US5319080 | US5321131 | WO9417093 | WO9420073 | US5354844 | US5356633 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5366878 | WO9426764 | US5371241 | EP0496813 | US5378825 | US5386023 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5395619 | US5399676 | US5403711 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5416016 | US5417978 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5446137 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5459127 | US5462854 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5469854 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5491133 | US5502177 | US5506351 | WO9610391 | US5508270 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5512295 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5521291 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5527528 | US5534259 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541306 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5540935 | US5543158 | US5543152 | US5545730 | US5547932 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5556948 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5565350 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5580575 | US5583020 | US5585481 | WO9640062 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5591721 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5595756 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | WO9704787 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5623065 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5652355 | US5652356 | US5658873 | WO9730731 | US5663312 | US5665710 | WO9732595 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5700920 | US5700922 | US5705188 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5750692 | - ZHANG, CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 33, pages 1 - 52 | - TONKS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 6731 - 6737 | - TONKS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 6722 - 6730 | - GOLDSTEIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 182, pages 91 - 99 | - SEELY ET AL., DIABETES, (1996), vol. 45, pages 1379 - 1385 | - CHEN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 8026 - 8031 | - ELCHEBLY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 283, pages 1544 - 1548 | - SCHIEVELLA ET AL., CELL. GROWTH DIFFER., (1993), vol. 4, pages 239 - 246 | - SHIFRIN; NEEL, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 25376 - 25384 | - SELL; REESE, MOL. GENET. METAB., (1999), vol. 66, pages 189 - 192 | - LIU; CHERNOFF, BIOCHEM. J., (1997), vol. 327, pages 139 - 145 | - LEE ET AL., J. BIOL.. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 15366 - 15372 | - WIENER ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1994), vol. 170, pages 1177 - 1183 | - BROWN-SHIMER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 478 - 482 | - LIU ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 250 - 259 | - LAMONTAGNE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1998), vol. 95, pages 14094 - 14099 | - LIU ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 173 - 176 | - BALSAMO ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 143, pages 523 - 532 | - ARREGUI ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 143, pages 861 - 873 | - HAM ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, pages 185 - 186 | - SKOREY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 22472 - 22480 | - TAING ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 3793 - 3803 | - TAYLOR ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 6, pages 1457 - 1468 | - WANG ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, pages 345 - 350 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 54, pages 703 - 711 | - YAO ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 6, pages 1799 - 1810 | - CHEN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 384 - 389 | - DESMARAIS ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1998), vol. 354, pages 225 - 231 | - ROLLER ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, pages 2149 - 2150 | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1994), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770 | - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118 | - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330 | - SVINARCHUK ET AL., 5 BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654 | - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973 | - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237 | - CROOKE ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 277, pages 923 - 937 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. OF PHARMA SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, pages 1385 - 1390 | - RITSCHEL, METH. FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 13, page 205 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, page 1385 | - HO ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1996), vol. 85, pages 138 - 143 | - LEE ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1991), page 92 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1987), vol. 147, pages 980 - 985 | - ZHOU ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1992), vol. 19, pages 269 - 274 | - WEINER ET AL., JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (1992), vol. 2, pages 405 - 410 | - PLESSIS ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 18, pages 259 - 265 | - HU ET AL., S.T.P.PHARMA. SCI., (1994), vol. 4, no. 6, page 466 | - ALLEN ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 223, page 42 | - WU ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, page 3765 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 6949 | - SUNAMOTO ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1980), vol. 53, page 2778 | - ILLUM ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1984), vol. 167, page 79 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 268, page 235 | - BLUME ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1990), vol. 1029, page 91 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 40, page 252 | - MURANISHI, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 1 - 33 | - EL HARIRI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 44, pages 651 - 654 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (1992), vol. 263, page 25 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1990), vol. 79, pages 579 - 583 | - JARRETT, J. CHROMATOGR., (1993), vol. 618, pages 315 - 339 | - BUUR ET AL., J. CONTROL REL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 43 - 51 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1987), vol. 39, pages 621 - 626 | - MIYAO ET AL., ANTISENSE RES. DEV., (1995), vol. 5, pages 115 - 121 | - TAKAKURA ET AL., ANTISENSE & NUCL. ACID DRUG DEV., (1996), vol. 6, pages 177 - 183 | - SANGHVI, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 21, pages 3197 - 3203 | - KAWASAKI, J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, pages 831 - 841 | - MARTIN, P., HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - "Peptide Nucleic Acids (PNA): Synthesis, Properties and Potential Applications", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 4, pages 5 - 23 | - CHIANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 18162 - 18171 | - MIURA ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1996), vol. 42, pages 1758 - 1764 |