EP2266960 - Aryl-substituted pyrazoles, imidazoles, oxazoles, thiazoles and pyrroles as anticonvulsants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogenkamp, Derk J 4510 Park Drive Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | 02 /
Upasani, Ravindra 63 Montecilo Fothill Ranch CA 92610 / US | 03 /
Nguyen, Phong 1048 Wingfood Street Placentia CA 92870 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10004963.4 | 24.03.2000 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US19990126553P | 26.03.1999 Original published format: US 126553 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2266960 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2266960 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266960 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/30, C07D233/54, A61K31/40, A61K31/415, A61K31/421, A61K31/426, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61K31/4164, A61K31/5377, C07D235/18, C07D277/56, C07D231/12, C07D233/64, C07D403/04, C07D207/416, C07D263/34 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C07D207/416 (EP,KR,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,KR,US);
C07D235/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | C07D231/10, C07D207/30, C07D233/54, A61K31/40, A61K31/415, A61K31/421, A61K31/426, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61K31/4164, A61K31/5377, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/52] | Title | German: | Arylsubstituierte Pyrazole, Imidazole, Oxazole,Thiazole und Pyrrole als Antikonvulsiva | [2010/52] | English: | Aryl-substituted pyrazoles, imidazoles, oxazoles, thiazoles and pyrroles as anticonvulsants | [2010/52] | French: | Pyrazoles, imidazoles, oxazoles, thiazoles et pyrroles, substitués d'aryl à titre d'anticonvulsants | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00919636.1 / EP1173169 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000919636) is 16.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.2014 | BE | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | IE | 24.03.2014 | LU | 24.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2016/29] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0192998 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,8 * compounds 5,48-50 *; | [X]EP0269238 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,6 * p. 19, lines 35 and 58 *; | [XD]JPH0725849 (NIPPON SODA CO) [XD] 1,6 * p. 5, table 1, cpd. 9 *; | [A]EP0640593 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* examples and page 8, lines 15-23 *; | [X]WO9840364 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * Ex. 1, cpd (c) Ex. 4 Ex. 17, cpds. (c) and (d) *; | [X] - H. SCHUBERT ET AL., "p-Aryl- und p-Alkoxyphenyl-imidazole", JOURNAL FUER PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, (1962), vol. 18, no. 3-4, pages 192 - 202, XP002659431 [X] 1,6 * p. 199, 2nd cpd. p. 200, 1st cpd. * | [X] - ROBERTSON D W ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF ARYLIMIDAZOPYRIDINE CARDIOTONICS: DISCOVERY AND INOTROPIC ACTIVITY OF 2-Ú2-METHOXY-4- (METHYLSULFINYL)PHENYL 3/4 -1 H-IMIDAZOÚ4,5-C 3/4 PYRIDINE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19850601), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1021/JM00383A006, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 717 - 727, XP000577047 [X] 1,6 * p. 722, table II (cpds. 32, 55) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00383a006 | [X] - YAMADA NAOTAKA ET AL, "Synthesis and bleaching activity of 1,5-disubstituted imidazoles", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, (19920101), vol. 56, no. 12, doi:10.1271/BBB.56.1943, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 1943 - 1948, XP002613769 [X] 1,6 * p. 1944, table I, cpd. 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.56.1943 | [X] - TROFIMOV ET AL., "Pyrroles from ketoximes and acetylene", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, (1978), vol. 14, pages 399 - 401, XP002659432 [X] 1,6 * Cpd. VIII * | [X] - HILBORN J G ET AL, "POLY(ARYL ETHER-BENZOXAZOLES)", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19900528), vol. 23, no. 11, doi:10.1021/MA00213A006, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 2854 - 2861, XP000175126 [X] 1,6,8 * page 2857; compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00213a006 | [X] - YAKOBIVICH V S ET AL, "Polybenzoxazoles. Synthesis and properties of polymers containing oxygen and sulphur atoms in the chain", POLYMER SCIENCE U.S.S.R, PERGAMON, vol. 9, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0032-3950(67)90023-8, ISSN 0032-3950, (19670101), pages 2227 - 2242, (19670101), XP024126680 [X] 1,6,8 * p. 2240, 7-9 p. 2240, 12-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3950(67)90023-8 | [X] - HEDRICK J L, "IMIDE-ARYL ETHER BENZOTHIAZOLES", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19920101), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(92)90113-B, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 1399 - 1405, XP002930513 [X] 1,6,8 * page 1402; compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(92)90113-B | [X] - RADWAN S M, "SYNTHESIS AND REACTIONS OF SOME DIPHENYL SULFIDES", COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY & BIOCHEMISTRY, PRAGUE; CZ, (19920101), vol. 57, doi:10.1135/CCCC19921553, ISSN 0010-0765, pages 1553 - 1558, XP002930514 [X] 1,6 * compounds Xa, Xc * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1135/cccc19921553 | [X] - KAWAMATSU Y ET AL, "2-Amino-4-phenylthiazole derivatives as anit-atherogenic agents", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (19810101), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 355 - 362, XP002254107 [X] 1,6 * p. 356, table I; entries 5, 6 * | by applicant | JPS5975257 | EP0269238 | EP0446180 | JPH05287563 | WO9323374 | JPH0725849 | WO9640628 | US5741818 | JPH10168063 | WO9850348 | WO9852940 | WO9911627 | - CATTERALL, W.A., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1987), vol. 8, pages 57 - 65 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1994), vol. 269, pages 854 - 859 | - BROWN ET AL., BRITISH J. PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 115, pages 1425 - 1432 | - STYS, J NEUROSCI., (1992), vol. 12, pages 430 - 439 | - BENSIM ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (1994), vol. 330, pages 585 - 591 | - TAYLOR; MELDRUM, TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1995), vol. 16, pages 309 - 316 | - DENICOTT ET AL., J. CLIN. PSYCHIATRY, (1994), vol. 55, pages 70 - 76 | - MOLLER, A. R, AM. J. OTOL., (1997), vol. 18, pages 577 - 585 | - TONNDORF, J, HEAR. RES., (1987), vol. 28, pages 271 - 275 | - SIMPSON, J. J.; DAVIES, E. W., TIP., (1999), vol. 20, pages 12 - 18 | - MAJUMDAR, B., CLIN. OROLARYNGOL., (1983), vol. 8, pages 175 - 180 | - DONALDSON, I., LAQYNGOL. OTOL., (1981), vol. 95, pages 947 - 951 | - CATTERALL, W.A, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 2-2, pages 50 - 61 | - CATTERALL, W.A., ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1980), vol. 10, pages 15 - 43 | - DIMMOCK ET AL., J MED CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 3984 - 3997 | - PEVARELLO ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 579 - 590 | - RADWAN, S. M., COLLECT CZECH CHEM. COMMUN., (1992), vol. 57, no. 7, pages 1553 - 1558 | - KORSHAK, K. K. ET AL., POLYM. SCI. USSR (ENGL. TRANSL.), (1964), vol. 6, no. 1087, pages 1196 - 1198 | - J. POLYM. SCI. PART A, (1965), vol. 3, pages 2425 - 2439 | - STILLE ET AL., J POLYM. SCI. PART A-1, (1968), vol. 6, pages 2317 - 2330 | - SZMANT ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1956), vol. 78, pages 4386 - 4389 | - GRANDBERG ET AL., J. GEN. CHEM. USSR (ENGL. TRANSL), (1960), vol. 30, pages 1404 - 1408 | - YAMADA ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 56, pages 1943 - 1948 | - KUWANO ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM, (1991), vol. 55, pages 2999 - 3004 | - WALKER ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1942), pages 347 - 350 | - SCHUBERT ET AL., J PRAKT. CHEM., (1962), vol. 18, no. 3-4, pages 192 - 202 | - TODOROVA ET AL., TR. NAUCHNOIZSLED. KHIM.-FARM. INST., (1978), vol. 10, pages 85 - 94 | - VODENICHAROV ET AL., DOKL. BOLG. AKAD NAUK., (1978), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 441 - 444 | - GOLANOVA ET AL., ZH. ORG. KHIM., (1993), vol. 29, pages 1319 - 1324 | - ERMIKOW ET AL., Z. OBSHCH. KHIM., (1988), vol. 58, pages 450 - 457 | - TROFIMOV ET AL., KHIM. GETEROTSIKL. SOEDIN., (1978), vol. 4, pages 489 - 491 | - KOROSTOVA ET AL., KHIM. GETERORSIKL. SOEDIN., (1992), vol. 5, pages 609 - 613 | - ANDERSON ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, pages 977 - 980 | - DANN ET AL., LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1984), vol. 3, pages 409 - 425 | - PICHON. M ET AL., TERRAHEDRON LETT., (1966), vol. 37, pages 7963 - 7966 | - FOURNIE-ZALUSKI, M-C. ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 2594 - 2608 | - VERDOOM, T.A. ET AL., NEURON, (1990), vol. 4, pages 919 - 928 | - HAMILL ET AL., PFLUEGERS ARCH., (1981), vol. 391, pages 85 - 100 | - VERDOOM, T.A ET AL., NEURON, (1990), vol. 4, pages 919 - 928 | - YASUSHI, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 6149 - 6152 | - CREVELING, MOL. PHARMACAL., (1983), vol. 23, pages 350 - 358 | - HUNSKAAR, S.; O. B. FASMER; K. HOLE. J., NEUROSCI. METHODS, (1985), vol. 14, pages 69 - 76 | - BUCHAN ET AL., STROKE, (1993), pages 148 - 152 | - SHEARDOWN ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 236, pages 347 - 353 | - GRAHAM, J PHARMACAL. EXP. THERAP., (1996), vol. 276, pages 1 - 4 | - WRATHALL, EXP. NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, pages 119 - 126 | - IWASAKI, J NEURO SCI., (1995), vol. 134, pages 21 - 25 | - RAGSDALE ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (1991), vol. 40, pages 756 - 765 | - KUO; BEAN, MOL. PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 46, pages 716 - 725 |