EP2218410 - Surgical clip applier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zergiebel, Earl M. 1422 Little Meadow Road Gullford CT 06430 / US | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2013/48] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Maschio & Soames LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | Lloyd, John Scott Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10005058.2 | 25.08.2009 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | US20080091467P | 25.08.2008 Original published format: US 91467 P | US20090540475 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: US 540475 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218410 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218410 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/128 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B17/083 (US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/12 (EP,US);
A61B17/1222 (US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | Chirurgischer Klammerapplikator | [2010/33] | English: | Surgical clip applier | [2010/33] | French: | Applicateur d'agrafes chirurgicales | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09252052.7 / EP2158850 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090252052) is 21.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2009 | AT | 27.11.2013 | BE | 27.11.2013 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | IT | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | NO | 27.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | LU | 25.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0089737 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XY]US4674504 (KLIEMAN CHARLES H [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 5-10; figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 2; | [Y]EP0409569 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]US5049152 (SIMON DENISE M [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 4-13; figures 1,9 * | Examination | US2007093856 | by applicant | US5030226 | US5431668 |