EP2271044 - Anonymous transactions in computer networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolev, Shlomi 7 Hazait Street Omer 84965 / IL | 02 /
Kopeetsky, Marina 15/1 HaAtzmaut Street Ashdod 77100 / IL | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2011/01] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005252.1 | 19.05.2010 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | IL20090199665 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: IL 19966509 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2271044 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2271044 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271044 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H04L63/0421 (EP);
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L9/321 (EP);
H04L9/3221 (EP);
H04L9/3236 (EP);
H04L2209/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2011/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anonyme Transaktionen in Computernetzwerken | [2011/01] | English: | Anonymous transactions in computer networks | [2011/01] | French: | Transactions anonymes dans les réseaux informatiques | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2010 | AL | 11.05.2016 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | IT | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | IE | 19.05.2016 | LU | 19.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002103999 (CAMNISCH JAN LEONHARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2012248 (NEC CHINA CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0112] * * figures 1,9 *; | [A] - J. Camenisch, A. lysyanskaya, "Efficient Non-transferable Anonymous Multi-show Credential System with Optional Anonymity Revocation", (2001), URL: http://www.zurich.ibm.com/~jca/papers/rz3295.pdf, (20110117), XP002616976 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - LYSYANSKAYA A ET AL, "Pseudonym Systems", SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY. ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, XX, XX, (19990810), pages 184 - 199, XP002210267 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [XP] - S. Dolver, M. Kopeetsky, "Anonymous transactions in computer networks", (20090810), URL: http://www.cs.bgu.ac.il/~frankel/TechRep/09-01/09-04.pdf, (20110117), XP002616895 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-05118-0_21 | [A] - DAVID CHAUM AND JAN-HENDRIK EVERTSE ED - ODLYZKO A M, A Secure and Privacy-Protected Protocol for transmitting Personal Information Between Organizations, ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY. SANTA BARBARA, AUG. 11 - 15, 1986; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON THEORY AND APPLICATIONS OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES (CRYPTO)], BERLIN, SPRINGER, DE, PAGE(S) 118 - 167, (19860101), XP002955991 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - E. GABBERP. GIBBONSY. MATIASA. MAYER, "How to Make Personalized Web Browsing Simple, Secure, and Anonymous", FINANCIAL CRYPTOGRAPHY: FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, FC, (1997), vol. 97, XP002616978 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | - A. BEIMEL; S. DOLEV, "Buses for Anonymous Message Delivery", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, (2003), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1007/s00145-002-0128-6, pages 25 - 39, XP001143422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00145-002-0128-6 | - S. DOLEV; R. OSTROVSKY, "Xor-Trees for Efficient Anonymous Multicast and Reception", ACM TRANSACTONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTE SECURITY, (2000), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 63 - 84 | - E. GABBER; P. GIBBONS; Y. MATIAS; A. MAYER, "How to Make Personalized Web Browsing Simple, Secure, and Anonymous", FINANCIAL CRYPTOGRAPHY: FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, FC, vol. 97, page 1997 | - L. LAMPORT, "Password Authentication with Insecure Communication", COMMUNICATIONS OFTHEACM, (1981), vol. 24, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1145/358790.358797, XP000577349 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/358790.358797 | - T. V. LEE; K. Q. NGUYEN; V. VARADHARAJAN, "How to Prove that a Committed Number is Prime", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, VOLUME 1716, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATIONS OF CRYPTOLOGY AND INFORMATION SECURITY ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY TABLE, (1999), vol. 1716, pages 208 - 218, XP019000322 |