EP2255948 - Method and device for producing a hollow plastic moulded part with at least one insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linbrunner Alois Handel- und Kunststoffbearbeitung (Einzelunternehmen) Pfarrer-Gabler-Str.l 14 84152 Mengkofen/Hofdorf / DE | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linbrunner, Alois Pfarrer-Gabler-Str. 14 84152 Mengkofen/Hofdorf / DE | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Bahnhofstrasse 5 94315 Straubing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 2 94315 Straubing / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005517.7 | 27.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | DE20091023173 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009023173 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2255948 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2255948 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/00, B29C51/12, B29C69/00, // B29C49/20, B29C51/26 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B29C51/12 (EP);
B29C49/0691 (EP);
B29C51/267 (EP);
B29C49/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | B29C49/00, B29C51/12, B29C69/00, // B29C49/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines hohlen Kunststoffformteils mit mindestens einem Einsatzteil | [2010/48] | English: | Method and device for producing a hollow plastic moulded part with at least one insert | [2010/48] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'une courbe de direction pour braquages de roues orientables d'un véhicule et système d'assistance au stationnement pour un véhicule | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1704387 (WOODALL INDUSTRIES INC) [Y] 1,7 * figures 8-18,26-30; claim 8 *; | [Y]EP0462481 (TETRA ALFA HOLDINGS [CH]) [Y] 1,4,7 * figures 1,2,6 * * page 1, lines 1-5,13-15 * * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 1 ** page 5, lines 11-20 *; | [Y]US2001015513 (SCHAFTINGEN JULES-JOSEPH VAN [BE], et al) [Y] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007000454 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [Y] 4,5,13 * page 5, lines 5-16 *; | [XY]EP1785258 (GEISS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-13; | [IY]WO2007140875 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [I] 1 * figures 1-7 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 30 * * page 7, lines 11-29 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]DE102006027254 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-10; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2008003387 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-12; claims c1,2 *; | [Y]US2008211128 (LUCIER NORMAND [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3,6-8,12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0045] , [0048] , [0053] - [0056] - [0058]; figures 1,4A,5-8 *; | [Y]US2009026664 (CRIEL BJORN [BE], et al) [Y] 4,5,13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1619006 |