EP2258672 - Optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC TOSHIBA Space Systems, Ltd. 10, Nisshin-cho 1-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-8551 / JP | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuno, Katsuhiko NEC TOSHIBA Space Systems, Ltd. 10, Nisshin-cho 1-chome Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8551 / JP | 02 /
Suyama, Shoko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Yoshiyasu c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2011/18] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Tsuno, Katsuhiko NEC TOSHIBA Space Systems, Ltd. 10, Nisshin-cho 1-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-8551 / JP | ||
02 /
Suyama, Shoko Inellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Yoshiyasu Inellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005658.9 | 31.05.2010 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP20090131918 | 01.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009131918 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258672 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/573, C04B37/00, G02B23/16, G02B5/08, G02B7/183 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
G02B17/0652 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
C04B37/008 (EP,US);
G02B23/16 (EP,US);
G02B7/183 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/616 (EP,US);
C04B2237/083 (EP,US);
C04B2237/16 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung | [2010/49] | English: | Optical device | [2010/49] | French: | Dispositif optique | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3934546 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [A] 3* column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 1; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19962831 (DLR EV [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 41; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE10035111 (INDUSTRIEANLAGEN BETRIEBSGES [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0128] - [0129]; figure 2 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]US2008043352 (LIU TONG [US]) [Y] 3-8 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046]; figures 1-9 *; | [X] - HARNISCH B ET AL, "ULTRA-LIGHTWEIGHT C/SIC MIRRORS AND STRUCTURES", ESA BULLETIN, ESA SCIENTIFIC AND PUBLICATIONS BRANCH, NOORDWIJK, NL, (19980801), no. 95, ISSN 0376-4265, pages 108 - 112, XP000776670 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1561737 | by applicant | JP2001348288 | JP2004317647 | JP2005022905 | JP2008137830 |