EP2230140 - Wiper blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390 Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref. 431-0493 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Hiroyuki c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 02 /
Torii, Naoki c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 03 /
Saito, Toshihiro c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 04 /
Takagi, Atsushi c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 05 /
Yano, Motoyasu c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 06 /
Matsumoto, Hiroshi c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 07 /
Kobayashi, Yukio c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | 08 /
Hirota, Yoshito c/o Asmo Co., Ltd., Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/38] | 01 /
Nakano, Hiroyuki Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | ||
02 /
Torii, Naoki Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
03 /
Saito, Toshihiro Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
04 /
Takagi, Atsushi Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
05 /
Yano, Motoyasu Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
06 /
Matsumoto, Hiroshi Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
07 /
Kobayashi, Yukio Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | |||
08 /
Hirota, Yoshito Asmo Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Dept. 390, Umeda Kosai-city Shizuoka-pref., 431-0493 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005753.8 | 28.12.2004 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | JP20040024787 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024787 | JP20040078948 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004078948 | JP20040085417 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004085417 | JP20040158106 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004158106 | JP20040239848 | 19.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004239848 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2230140 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2230140 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
B60S1/3806 (EP);
B60S1/38 (KR);
B60S1/32 (KR);
B60S2001/3813 (EP);
B60S2001/3815 (EP);
B60S2001/3822 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/38] | Title | German: | Wischerblatt | [2010/38] | English: | Wiper blade | [2010/38] | French: | Essuie-glace | [2010/38] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 03.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04030904.9 / EP1559623 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040030904) is 25.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19745460 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 2 - column 6, line 27; figure - *; | [A]DE4116968 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5946764 (TWORZYDLO WLODZIMIERZ WOYTEK [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19938662 (VALEO AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0728759U | JPH0726266U |