EP2243424 - Biologic information detecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tatara, Naoe c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Aihara, Kimihisa NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-1, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Mino, Shinji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-1, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Koizumi, Hiroshi NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
Hayashida, Shoichi NTT Intellectual Property Ctr. 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 06 /
Oguchi, Taisuke c/o NTT Intellectual Property Ctr 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 07 /
Shimada, Junichi NTT Intellectual Property Ctr. 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 08 /
Sudo, Shoichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Ctr. 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 1808-585 / JP | 09 /
Tochikubo, Osamu 243-108 Setogaya-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 240-0024 / JP | 10 /
Miura, Hidetoshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Tatare, Naoe c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Aihara, Kimihisa c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Mino, Shinji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Koizumi, Hiroshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
05 /
Hayashida, Shoichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
06 /
Oguchi, Taisuke c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
07 /
Shimada, Junichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
08 /
Sudo, Shoichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
09 /
Tochikubo, Osamu 243-108 Setogaya-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 240-0024 / JP | |||
10 /
Miura, Hidetoshi c/o NTT Int. Property center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | |||
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
Tatare, Naoe c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Aihara, Kimihisa c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Mino, Shinji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Koizumi, Hiroshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
05 /
Hayashida, Shoichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
06 /
Oguchi, Taisuke c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
07 /
Shimada, Junichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
08 /
Sudo, Shoichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
09 /
Tochikubo, Osamu 243-108 Setogaya-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 240-0024 / JP | |||
10 /
Miura, Hidetoshi c/o NTT Advanced Technology Co. Int. Property Management Business Department Musashino Center Building 6F, 1-19-18 Nakacho, Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-0006 / JP | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/52] |
Former [2010/43] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005862.7 | 04.10.2005 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040293238 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004293238 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243424 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2243424 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/6816 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (KR);
A61B5/02 (KR);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/6817 (EP,US);
A61B5/02241 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44427 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | A61B5/00, A61B5/024 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/52] |
Former [2010/43] | DE, GB | Title | German: | Biologische Informationsdetektionsvorrichtung | [2010/43] | English: | Biologic information detecting apparatus | [2010/43] | French: | Appareil de détection d'informations biologiques | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05790242.1 / EP1806094 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4029083 (BAYLOR CARL S) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 56 * [I] 3-9; | [E]EP1671578 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [E] 1,3-7 * figures 82-98 * * paragraphs [0323] - [0419] *; | [XI]US2002173709 (FINE ILYA [IL], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] * [I] 2-9; | [E]EP1867278 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-6,9 * figures 1-6,20,21 * * paragraph [0048] * * the whole document *; | [X]EP1217941 (ORSENSE LTD [IL]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0019] , [0020] , [0022] , [0024] *; | [A]US4730621 (STOTT FRANK D [GB]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 21 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5267566 (CHOUCAIR MAGED [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH09122083 | JPH11128174 | - ILLUSTRATED HUMAN ANATOMY, (19961001), vol. 1, page 126 | - LLUSTRATED HUMAN ANATOMY, (19961001), vol. 1, page 127 |